Sustackova, Helena (CPSO#: 76371)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
619A Bloor St West
Toronto ON  M6G 1K8
Phone: (647) 367-5257
Fax: (647) 367-5257
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELENA SUSTACKOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUSTACKOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2003