Sutcliffe, Penelope Ann (CPSO#: 67411)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sudbury & District Health Unit
1300 Paris Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3A3
Phone: (705) 522-9200 Ext. 291
Fax: (705) 677-9606
Electoral District: 08

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PENELOPE ANN SUTCLIFFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUTCLIFFE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1993