Sutcliffe, Steven David Ian (CPSO#: 65627)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012