Sutherland, Norman Gregor (CPSO#: 23341)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 May 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 May 2007

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Nov 2006
Summary:

 On Monday, November 27, 2006, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Sutherland to have committed acts 
 of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician.  

The Committee 
 ordered Dr. Sutherland to be reprimanded. 

The Discipline Committee directed the results of this 
 proceeding to be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 27, 2006


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Jul 1996
Summary:

In July 1996, Dr. Sutherland pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the records that 
are required to be kept respecting his patients as defined in s. 27(3) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended and s. 29(3) of 
Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended.    Dr. Sutherland also pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct in that 
he made improper use of the authority to prescribe a drug, as defined in s. 29(27) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended. 
The Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. Sutherland guilty of professional misconduct. In addition, the Discipline 
Committee found Dr. Sutherland guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 29(33) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as 
amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.    Consequently, 
the Discipline Committee imposed the following penalty: 
 
1)    A reprimand in relation to the finding of professional misconduct as defined in s. 29(33) of Ontario Regulation 
      548/90, as amended.    The fact of the reprimand was to be recorded on the Register. 
 
2)    A three (3) month suspension of Dr. Sutherland s certificate of registration. This suspension was to be suspended 
      provided Dr. Sutherland complied with the following terms: 
 
      a)    Dr. Sutherland was to take, at his own expense, the one-day course on record keeping specified by the 
            Discipline Committee; 
 
      b)    Dr.    Sutherland was to take, at his own expense, the three-day course on prescribing skills, focussing on 
            addictive and psychoactive drugs, as specified by the Discipline Committee; and 
 
      c)    Dr. Sutherland was to agree to annual inspections of his practice at his own expense, on notice from the 
            College for three years, such inspections to have a particular emphasis on record keeping, prescribing 
            patterns, and quality of care as assessed through his records. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 08, 1996


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Mar 1974
Summary:

 In March 1974, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Sutherland guilty of professional misconduct with 
 respect to five charges; in that he performed a surgical procedure on patients without taking a 
 history and conducting a physical examination and causing the said history and result of the 
 examination to be recorded on the patients( chart within 72 hours of admission of each patient to 
 hospital and/or prior to performing the surgery performing the surgery; in that he performed a 
 surgical procedure at a hospital on patients without first obtaining a consultation as required by 
 a directive of the Medical Advisory Committee of that hospital; in that he demonstrated poor 
 medical skill and judgment and/or management with respect to patients at the hospital; he 
 displayed poor professional acumen and/or he exposed patients to unnecessary hazards in failing to 
 seek a consultation in cases of a difficult nature; at the hospital, he jeopardized the welfare of 
 patients by displaying an alarming reluctance to accept the opinions of 
 consultants.

Consequently, the Committee ordered the following penalty:

In respect of two of the 
 five charges, the Committee directed that Dr. Sutherland be suspended from the Register of the 
 College for a period of three months.

In respect of the remaining three charges, the Discipline 
 Committee recommended to the Council of the College that Dr. Sutherland be erased from the 
 Register of the college of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario and then transferred to the Special 
 Register, Classification #7, with full practice privileges provided he submits to a surgeon named 
 by the College a satisfactory monthly report of his surgery for a period of twelve months.

The 
 Committee further directs that Dr. Sutherland do pay the costs of the hearing including the cost 
 of reporting the evidence provided that the College may accept the sum of $12,000.00 in full 
 satisfaction of all costs if paid to the College on or before June 30, 1974.

Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 12 Nov 1973