Sutherland, William Arnot (CPSO#: 23107)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1970
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Dec 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012