Sutradhar, Subir (CPSO#: 96831)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of General Surgery
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5599
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUBIR SUTRADHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUTRADHAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 26 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016