Sutton, Kimberly Marion (CPSO#: 103419)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  05 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional
Health Centre
Department of Family Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLY MARION SUTTON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SUTTON is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. SUTTON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SUTTON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SUTTON shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SUTTON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SUTTON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 05 Feb 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 05 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Feb 2018