Sutton, Robert Elliston (CPSO#: 22821)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Limited 1 High Meadow Place North York ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 10 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016