Suzuki, Aya (CPSO#: 81016)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: Goto, Aya (used until: 06 Apr 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 257
346 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone: (613) 623-2048
Fax: (613) 623-6719
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aya Suzuki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Suzuki ( CPSO# 81016 )

Business Address:
Suite 257
346 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-2048

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AYA SUZUKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUZUKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006