Sveinbjornson, Timothy Paul (CPSO#: 59585)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jul 1994