Swackhammer, Warren Byron (CPSO#: 20727)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Swackhammer, W B (used until: 23 Jul 1987 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jan 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 30 Apr 1992
Summary:

On April 30, 1992, The Fitness to Practise Committee finds that Dr. Swackhammer is an 
incapacitated member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario pursuant to clause 
62(1)(b) of the Health Disciplines Act. 
 
The Fitness to Practise Committee orders the following as terms and conditions of  Dr.     
Swackhammer s licence: 
 
1. that he engage in the practice of medicine in association with another health care professional 
   acceptable to the Registrar who shall monitor and file yearly reports to the College; 
 
2. that he regularly see a physician familiar with the treatment of substance abuse acceptable to 
   the Registrar and who shall monitor and file quarterly reports to the College; 
 
 3.  that should any person who has executed an acknowledgement and undertaking for Dr.      
             Swackhammer pursuant to the order of the Fitness to Practise Committee be unable 
or                    unwilling to continue under the terms of the acknowledgement and 
undertaking, Dr.                       Swackhammer will provide, within thirty days, a fresh 
acknowledgement and undertaking              from a similarly qualified person who is 
satisfactory to the Registrar; 
 
4. that he abstain totally from the consumption of narcotics or controlled drugs or their 
   preparations unless prescribed by his treating physician; 
 
5. that he not possess or prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs or their preparations.  However, 
   Dr. Swackhammer may prescribe these drugs to his patients admitted to a public hospital if 
   the drugs are administered by someone else. 
 
6.   that if Dr. Swackhammer is unable or unwilling to comply with any provision of this order,  
          he shall cease practising until he can once again bring himself into full compliance 
with the           order. 
 
A subsequent order was made by the Fitness to Practise Committee to delete the condition 
appearing in paragraph 5 and replace it with the following: 
 
5.   Dr. Warren B. Swackhammer is permitted to prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs or their 
          preparations, provided that he complete the course Prescribing Narcotics and 
Controlled               Drugs  offered by the University of Toronto by December 31, 1997.  
Should Dr.                          Swackhammer fail to complete the course as required, he 
shall not prescribe narcotics, or               controlled drugs or their preparations.     
 
On June 29, 2000, the Fitness to Practice Committee directed the Registrar to remove the terms, 
conditions and limitations imposed on Dr. Warren B. Swackhammer s Certificate of Registration 
by Order dated April 30, 1992 and amended by Order dated November 21, 1996.   

Appeal: No Appeal