Swain, John Richard (CPSO#: 22551)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of London, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Swain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2010


Corporation Name: John Richard Swain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 17 2012

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Glarier Medical Centre 11 Gibb Street Oshawa, Ontario L1H 2J9
Date Received: 01 Jun 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012