Swaine, Frederick Baird (CPSO#: 52159)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fred B. Swaine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 30 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: William Osler Health Centre Department of Laboratory Medicine 2100 Bovaird Drive East Brampton, ON L6R 3J7
Date Received: 25 Apr 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 11 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1983
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Mar 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017