Swallow, Carol Jane (CPSO#: 54151)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 1225
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-1558
Fax: (416) 586-8392
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: 4169462000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROL JANE SWALLOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWALLOW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Research Fellows - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1993