Swaminath, Anand (CPSO#: 80774)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Ext. 63123
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anand Swaminath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Swaminath ( CPSO# 80774 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Suite 4-204D
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANAND SWAMINATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAMINATH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2011