Swaminath, Sam (CPSO#: 55175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Feb 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Dec 1988

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Swaminath, Rangasamudram Subramanyam (used until: 11 Jul 1999 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Tamil, Telugu

Education:Osmania University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 Christina Street North
Sarnia ON  N7V 3C2
Phone: (519) 337-3261
Fax: (519) 337-5898
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

660 Ireland Road
Simcoe ON  N3Y 4L8
Canada
Phone: (519) 426-3561
Fax: 519 426-8029
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sam Swaminath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Swaminath ( CPSO# 55175 )

Business Address:
700 Christina Street North
Sarnia ON  N7V 3C2
Phone Number: (519) 337-3261

Business Address:
Sprucedale Youth Centre
660 Ireland Road
Simcoe ON  N3Y 4L8
Phone Number: (519) 426-3581

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care,St Thomas Mental Health Site St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1988
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 1988

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 1988 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Sam S. Swaminath's certificate of registration is restricted to the
            practice of Psychiatry.