Swaminathan, Aparna (CPSO#: 90336)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Tamil

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Paediatric School Outreach Clinic
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-393-1279 Ext. ext 20042
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. APARNA SWAMINATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAMINATHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2009