Swaminathan, Enoka Geraldine (CPSO#: 96927)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Avalon University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orangeville Family Medical Centre
Suite 100
1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville ON  L9W 7N7
Phone: (519) 938-8000
Fax: (519) 938-8080
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Enoka Swaminathan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Swaminathan ( CPSO# 96927 )

Business Address:
Orangeville Family Medical Centre
100 - 1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville ON  L9W 7N7
Phone Number: (519) 938-8000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ENOKA GERALDINE SWAMINATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAMINATHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2011 to 17 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 09 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014