Swan, James Henry (CPSO#: 24589)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2nd Floor
235 Salem Road
Ajax ON  L1Z 0B1
Canada
Phone: (905) 426-8333
Fax: (905) 426-4447
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

393 First ST
Suite 300
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1B3
Canada
Phone: (705) 444-1648
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Mar 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES HENRY SWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1972