Swan, Kathryn Michelle (CPSO#: 87161)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College, Cork, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
2200 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7R 4H9
Phone: (905) 632-2542
Fax: (905) 632-2617
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRYN MICHELLE SWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2010