Swanson, Leonard Paul (CPSO#: 62875)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  June 13, 2008
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
NOTICE OF SUSPENSION OF PRIVILEGES: On June 18, 2008, Brockville General Hospital notified the College that Dr. Leonard Paul Swanson's privileges at the Charles Street Site and the Garden Street Site of Brockville General Hospital were suspended, effective June 13, 2008.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2009

Concerns

Source: Executive Committee
Active Date: February 16, 2010
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Leonard Paul Swanson, to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

A (1) I, Dr. Leonard Paul Swanson:

(2) Resigned from the College effective June 4, 2009.
B (1) Undertake to never apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practice medicine in Ontario or in any other jurisdiction in Canada.
(2) Undertake to notify the College, ten (10) days prior to submitting my application, if I ever apply for a licence to practice medicine in any jurisdiction outside Canada.
C (2) Acknowledge that, in exchange for this Undertaking, the College agrees to discontinue all of its outstanding investigations pertaining to the sexual abuse of patients, breach of undertaking, and clinical matters.
(6) Acknowledge that if a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee is made pursuant to the terms of this Undertaking, or related to the subject matter of this Undertaking, the College will be entitled to introduce this Undertaking as evidence at the hearing before the Discipline Committee.
(10) Acknowledge that nothing in this Undertaking affects or restricts the College’s ability to communicate information pursuant to section 36 of the RHPA.
D (1) Consent to the terms of this Undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.