Swanston, William Henry (CPSO#: 23003)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of West Indies, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Trinidad and Tobago

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 13 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1970
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 17 Jan 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016