Swanstrom, Lee Leray (CPSO#: 68655)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Creighton University School of Medicine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Electoral District: 04

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Jan 1995 to 10 Feb 1995
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Feb 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 2002