Swart, Greta Toni (CPSO#: 29438)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Swart's medical records will remain with: C P R I 600 Sanatorium Road London, ON N6H 3W7 Tel: (519) 858-2774
Date Received: 30 Apr 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2013