Swart, Maritza (CPSO#: 86984)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock General Hospital
Department of General Surgery
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone: 5194214211 Ext. 0
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suit 102
333 Athlone Ave
Woodstock ON  N4V0B8
Canada
Phone: (519) 290-0192
Fax: (519) 290-0957
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Swart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Swart ( CPSO# 86984 )

Business Address:
310 Juliana Drive
Department of General Surgery
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 06 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARITZA SWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014