Swartz, David Solomon (CPSO#: 62188)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
c/o Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2041
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Swartz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Swartz ( CPSO# 62188 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2041

Business Address:
Woodbine Endoscopy
Suite 130
100 Renfrew Drive
Markham ON  L3R 9R6
Phone Number: (905) 948-9119

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID SOLOMON SWARTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWARTZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1991