Swayze, Ian Gary (CPSO#: 65559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
1001 Queen St. West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32464
Fax: (416) 583-1324
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN GARY SWAYZE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAYZE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993