Sweeney, John Paul (CPSO#: 17464)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1965 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 28 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 2010