Sweet, Daniel Charles (CPSO#: 51840)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1982 to 15 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2001
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 06 Aug 2002
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 03 Jun 2004
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Oct 2004
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 May 2008
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2012
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Aug 2012
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 28 Jan 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 2017

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Jul 2017
Summary:

On July 14, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Daniel Charles Sweet committed an 
act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession and in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
  
Dr. Sweet is a family physician who was practising in Ottawa. He received his certificate of 
registration authorizing independent practice in Ontario in June 1982 and was certified by the 
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada as a specialist in Anesthesiology on June 7, 
1989. Dr. Sweet transitioned from Anesthesiology to family medicine in 1994. 
       
BACKGROUND 
       
On August 6, 2002, the Discipline Committee ordered the Registrar to impose terms, limitations 
and conditions on Dr. Sweet’s certificate of registration, including restricting him from 
prescribing any controlled substances as defined by the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, 
1996. On October 5, 2006, Dr. Sweet entered into an Undertaking with the College, and agreed 
to cease to practise addiction medicine, chronic pain medicine and psychotherapy.  
 
DISGRACEFUL, DISHONOURABLE AND UNPROFESSIONAL CONDUCT 
 
Breach of 2002 Discipline Committee Order 
 
Dr. Sweet breached the 2002 Order of the Discipline Committee by prescribing controlled 
substances on three occasions:  
 
-  On October 17, 2014, Dr. Sweet prescribed Androgel to Patient B; 
-  On January 3, 2015, Dr. Sweet renewed a prescription of Clonazepam to Patient C; 
-  On December 14, 2016, Dr. Sweet prescribed a hormone replacement therapy containing 
   Testosterone to Patient E. 
 
Prescribing Botox to Patient E 
 
Dr. Sweet was Patient E’s family physician. In 2013, the College commenced an investigation 
into whether Patient E, who is not a regulated health professional, was performing rhinoplasties 
and injecting Botox at a clinic in her home.   
 
In 2014, in the course of its investigation of Patient E, the College interviewed Dr. Sweet. Dr. 
Sweet indicated that Patient E was his patient since approximately 2010. He noted that about one 
or two years prior, Patient E informed him that she was performing face lifts and injections and 
tried to “lure” him into her cosmetic work by asking him to order local anaesthetics for her. Dr. 
Sweet indicated that he advised Patient E that these are obtained through a prescription and 
declined to order them. He stated that he had never purchased Botox or injected Botox in his 
entire career. 

Following a temporary injunction order, dated March 6, 2014 and final injunction order, dated 
May 22, 2014 obtained by the College from the Superior Court of Justice, Patient E was ordered 
to permanently refrain from performing all controlled acts and other acts relating to the practice 
of medicine, including administering a substance by injection.   

 
In 2016, the College conducted an investigation into whether Patient E was in breach of these 
Orders. A College investigator learned that Dr. Sweet had prescribed Botox to Patient E. 
 
On November 10, 2016, Dr. Sweet indicated to the College investigator that since his last 
interview with the College in relation to Patient E and her esthetic business, he had taken a Botox 
training course to treat migraine headaches. He stated that he prescribed Botox to Patient E on 
two occasions:  
 
-  On April 25, 2016, Dr. Sweet prescribed Botox to Patient E on the assumption that she 
   needed it for an injection to be performed by another physician for treatment of her chronic 
   pain. He did not confirm with the other physician the reason for the prescription and never 
   followed up with Patient E regarding the injection by the other physician.  
-  On September 28, 2016, Dr. Sweet prescribed Botox to Patient E again and she was to return 
   for the injection on October 1, 2016. However, she did not show up. Dr. Sweet was 
   unsuccessful in following up with Patient E to determine why she did not attend for her 
   appointment.  
 
Dr. Sweet indicated that it did not occur to him that Patient E might be diverting the Botox given 
the small amount he prescribed. 
 
Breach of October 5, 2006 Undertaking – Care and Treatment of Patient D 
 
In February 2015, a community social worker at a homeless shelter informed the College that a 
shelter client (Patient F), who was a former addict, had received free samples of Ralivia (also 
known as Tramadol) from Dr. Sweet for pain management. The College commenced an 
investigation into whether Dr. Sweet had breached his October 5, 2006 Undertaking to cease 
practising addiction and chronic pain medicine. The College retained an expert who reviewed 25 
patient charts and interviewed Dr. Sweet. Dr. Sweet retained an expert who reviewed the same 
charts. 
 
The College expert, a specialist in family medicine, opined that Dr. Sweet engaged in the 
practice of chronic pain management and in the practice of addiction management in respect to 
one of the patients, Patient D, as follows: 
 
- Between September 2012 and October 2014, fifteen of Patient D’s appointments with Dr. 
  Sweet involved some level of assessment or treatment of Patient D’s chronic pain, and on at 
  least two occasions tramadol prescriptions were provided outside of a clinic visit;  
- Dr. Sweet failed to adequately attempt to transfer Patient D to another physician for the 
  treatment of Patient D’s pain symptoms;   
- Dr. Sweet prescribed clonidine and tramadol to Patient D and utilized tramadol for the 
  treatment of addiction.  
       
Dr. Sweet’s expert, also a specialist in family medicine, did not provide an opinion whether Dr. 
Sweet engaged in the practice of chronic pain management and in the practice of addiction 
management in respect of Patient D. 
 
FAILURE TO MAINTAIN THE STANDARD OF PRACTICE OF THE PROFESSION 
 
Patient Charts reviewed by College Expert and Dr. Sweet’s Expert 
 
The College expert who reviewed the patient charts in respect of Patient D and others concluded 
that Dr. Sweet failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in respect of fifteen of 
the twenty-five patients whose charts were reviewed. 
 
Dr. Sweet’s expert concluded that Dr. Sweet failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession in his care and treatment of Patient F, the person about whom the community social 
worker had contacted the College on February 25, 2015.   
 
Reassessment pursuant to August 16, 2013 Undertaking 
 
As a result of a prior College process, Dr. Sweet entered into an Undertaking dated August 16, 
2013, pursuant to which he was to undergo a period of clinical supervision for 6 months, 
followed by a reassessment of his practice. The College assessor, a different family physician 
from the College expert who reviewed the patient charts in respect of Patient D and others, 
reviewed additional twenty-five patient charts and concluded that Dr. Sweet failed to maintain 
the standard of practice of the profession in respect to fifteen patients, in that:  
       
-  Dr. Sweet failed to document a patient encounter with Patient G at which an injection was 
   administered and at which he prescribed a medication; 
-  Dr. Sweet did not provide adequate preventative care and failed to adequately work up or 
   manage the Patient H’s diagnosis of reflex sympathetic dystrophy; 
-  Dr. Sweet failed to document that he discussed the risks and side effects of prescribing 
   Imovane, a sedative, as a sleep aid to Patient I who was a 90-year-old patient with poor 
   mobility requiring the use of a cane and had  a  history of pelvic fracture due to fall; 
-  Dr. Sweet’s charting and documentation in relation to Patient J had inconsistencies, including 
   two different chart notes for the same clinical encounter; 
-  Dr. Sweet’s charting and documentation in relation to Patient K was inconsistent and that he 
   prescribed Myrbetriq for enuresis to this 9-year-old patient at a time when Myrbetriq was not 
   approved for use in children; 
-  Dr. Sweet’s pediatric patient’s immunizations for Patient L were incomplete or incompletely 
   documented; 
-  Dr. Sweet failed to investigate and rule out a possible G.I. source for Patient M’s anemia, in 
   circumstances where the patient may have had a hysterectomy. 
   
Dr. Sweet’s expert reviewed the same patient charts and agreed with the College assessor that 
Dr. Sweet failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession with respect to three 
patients (Patients I, K, and M).  Dr. Sweet’s assessor further opined that Dr. Sweet may have 
failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in that:  
 
-  Dr. Sweet prescribed to Patient N a year-long course of Wellbutrin, an anti-depressant ten 
   days after she had been assessed in the Emergency Room for depression and without a 
   clinical encounter at the time of the prescription; 
-  Dr. Sweet’s pediatric patient’s (Patient O) immunizations were incomplete or incompletely 
   documented. 
 
DISPOSITION 
 
On July 12, 2017, Dr. Sweet signed an undertaking and agreed to resign from the College 
effective July 12, 2017 and not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise 
medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after July 12, 2017. 
 
On July 14, 2017, in light of the undertaking to resign and to not re-apply, the Committee 
ordered and directed on the matter of penalty and costs that: 
 
  -   Dr. Sweet attend before the panel to be reprimanded.  
  -  Dr. Sweet pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,500.00 within thirty (30) days of 
     the date this Order becomes final.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing Date: July 14, 2017


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Feb 2012
Summary:

On February 22, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Daniel Charles Sweet committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to 
the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  
 
This was Dr. Sweet's fourth appearance before the Discipline Committee. 
 
Dr. Sweet prescribed Delatestryl and Cessamet in contravention of a 2002 Discipline Committee 
Order that he not prescribe narcotics and controlled substances.   
 
Dr. Sweet saw Patient A in June of 2010 who complained of Erectile Dysfunction, in addition to 
other problems. Dr. Sweet states that he planned to send Patient A to an Erectile Dysfunction 
Clinic where he could be assessed and treated. Dr. Sweet advised Patient A of the plan. The 
patient was insistent that he wanted a prescription for Delatestryl immediately and was not 
content to wait for his referral. Dr. Sweet reports that Patient A is a large gentleman and that Dr. 
Sweet felt pressured to provide him with the requested prescription which he provided on a 
one-time basis. 
 
Dr. Sweet saw Patient B in October 2010. Patient B was being followed by a psychologist for his 
Post Traumatic Stress Disorder. Patient B reported feeling anxious and reported that he had heard 
that Cessamet could help with his anxiety and stress. Patient B requested a prescription for 
Cessamet. Initially Dr. Sweet advised Patient B that he could not prescribe controlled substance 
and offered Patient B the alternatives of Seroquel or Olanzapine. Patient B told Dr. Sweet that 
Cessamet was not a controlled substance. Dr. Sweet provided the prescription with instructions 
to tell the pharmacist that if this substance was controlled then the prescription should not be 
filled. The prescription was subsequently returned to the Clinic and Dr. Sweet prescribed 
Olanzapine instead. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    the Registrar suspend Dr. Sweet's certificate of registration for a period of four (4) 
      months, to commence April 1, 2012.  
 
2.    Dr. Sweet appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 
3.    the terms, conditions and limitations currently on Dr. Sweet's certificate of registration 
      shall remain in full force and effect. 
 
4.    Dr. Sweet pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650.00, within 90 days of the date 
      of this Order.  
 
5.    the results of this proceeding to be included in the register. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): February 22, 2012


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Apr 2008
Summary:

 On April 29, 2008, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 
 found that Dr. Daniel Charles Sweet committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has 
 engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard 
 to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional.   The Discipline Committee ordered and directed the following:
 

1)	The 
 Discipline Committee directs Dr. Sweet to appear before the Discipline Panel to be reprimanded.

 
 2) 	The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Sweet(s certificate of 
 registration for a period of two (2) months, to commence on May 1, 2008.

 3) 	The Discipline 
 Committee orders Dr. Sweet to pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within 60 days 
 of the date of this Order.

 4)  	The Discipline Committee directs that the terms, conditions and 
 limitations currently on Dr. Sweet(s certificate of registration shall remain in full force and 
 effect.

5) 	The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the 
 register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 29, 2008


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Jun 2004
Summary:

 On June 3, 2004, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Sweet to have committed an act of professional 
 misconduct that would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional by prescribing either Tylenol #3 or clonazepam on six different occasions in 
 contravention of terms, conditions and limitations on his certificate of registration imposed in 
 an earlier order of the Discipline Committee dated August 6, 2002.

The Committee ordered the 
 following penalty:

1)	The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Sweet(s 
 certificate of 	registration for a period of three (3) months, to commence on July 1, 
 2004.

2)	The Discipline Committee directs that the terms, conditions and limitations currently on 
 	Dr. Sweet(s certificate of registration shall remain in full force and effect.

3)	The Discipline 
 Committee directs that the following term, conditions and limitation be 	imposed on Dr. Sweet(s 
 certificate of registration:

a)	That Dr. Daniel Charles Sweet must successfully complete an 
 ethics course 		acceptable to the College by October 31, 2004.

4)	The Discipline Committee 
 directs that if the Registrar receives information which 	indicates that there has been failure to 
 comply with any terms of this Order, the Registrar 	shall suspend Dr. Sweet(s certificate of 
 registration immediately and provide Dr. Sweet 	with fourteen days( notice that the matter will be 
 reported to the Executive Committee.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 03, 2004


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Aug 2002
Summary:

 On August 6, 2002, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Sweet(s plea of guilty and found him 
 guilty of incompetence in that he displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard 
 for the welfare of the patients of a nature and that his practice be restricted.  The Committee 
 directs the Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Sweet(s 
 certificate of registration:

1)	that Dr. Daniel Charles Sweet be restricted from prescribing any 
 controlled 		substances as defined by the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, 1996, being 		any 
 substance included in Schedules I, II, III, IV and V of that Act, and

2)   	that Dr. Daniel 
 Charles Sweet display a sign in plain view to patients entering his 	office waiting room notifying 
 patients that he is restricted from prescribing any 	controlled substances included in Schedules 
 I, II, III, IV and V of the Controlled 	Drugs and Substances Act, 1996;

3)		that the terms, 
 conditions and limitations on Dr. Sweet(s certificate of registration, 	as set out in paragraph 
 (1) and (2) above, shall remain in full force and effect 	unless and until they are removed or 
 varied by a subsequent panel of the 		Discipline Committee on application for that purpose; 
 and,

4)		that Dr. Sweet shall pay the College its costs in the amount of $2,500.00 within 	one 
 month of the date of this order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 06, 2002

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: July 12, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Daniel Charles Sweet to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 12, 2017:

Dr. Sweet was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence.

Dr. Sweet admitted that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, and that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

Dr. Sweet also signed an undertaking never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. On the basis of Dr. Sweet’s admissions and undertaking, the College withdrew the allegation of incompetence set out in the Notice of Hearing.
Download Full Document (PDF)