Sweet, Margaret Elizabeth (CPSO#: 56982)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 684-6707
Fax: (866)965-5899
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Margaret Elizabeth Sweet Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sweet ( CPSO# 56982 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone Number: (807) 684-6707

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 24 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET ELIZABETH SWEET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWEET is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1987