Sweet, Vanessa Lynn (CPSO#: 95545)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: Versteeg, Vanessa Lynn (used until: 02 Aug 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 28 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Dec 2016