Sweezey, Neil Bruce (CPSO#: 32882)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Sep 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Respiratory Medicine
The Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5128
Fax: (416) 813-6246
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 25 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL BRUCE SWEEZEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWEEZEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1981