Sweidan, Maher Atif Yousef (CPSO#: 103597)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Peshawar, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 May 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHER ATIF YOUSEF SWEIDAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWEIDAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 29 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2017