Swekla, Michaela (CPSO#: 97111)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Dec 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, German, Slovak

Education:Univerzita Komenskeho,Bratislava, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2333
Electoral District: 03

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Dec 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Michaela  Swelka may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine,
            as a hospitalist, only.