Swensson-Rosenquist, Gerrard Eric (CPSO#: 17530)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Winchester District Memorial Hospital 566 Louise Street Winchester ON K0C 2K0
Date Received: 24 Mar 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1960
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016