Swift, Irene Mavis (CPSO#: 22412)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Feb 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Feb 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jun 2009