Swiggum, Susan Mary Margaret (CPSO#: 29871)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: Reilly, Susan Mary Margaret (used until: 30 Aug 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 875 Carling Avenue Ottawa ON K1S 5P1
Date Received: 25 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017