Swinamer, Stuart Alan (CPSO#: 65614)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
Room B6-120
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 15109
Fax: (519) 679-6414
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Swinamer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Swinamer ( CPSO# 65614 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
Room B6-120
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STUART ALAN SWINAMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWINAMER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 13 Jul 1992
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 1992 to 10 Aug 1992
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Aug 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1993