Swinson, Richard Price (CPSO#: 27001)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St.Joesph's Hospital 50 Charton Ave E Hamilton ON L8P 3B6
Date Received: 03 May 2018


Address: ATTN: Tiffany Johnston Anxiety Treatment and Research Clinic Sr. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton 100 West 5th Street, Level 1, Block B Hamilton, ON L8N 3K7 Phone: 905-522-1155 Ext 34964 Fax: 905-521-6120
Date Received: 14 Dec 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018