Sy, Keiyan (CPSO#: 87380)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin, Taiwanese

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: 905-813-2200 Ext. 6336
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Keiyan Sy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sy ( CPSO# 87380 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEIYAN SY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013