Sy, Peter Yu (CPSO#: 52145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Nov 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Tagalog

Education:Far Eastern University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tomken Centre
925 Rathburn Road East
Mississauga ON  L4W 4C3
Phone: (905) 848-6633
Fax: (905) 848-6635
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Sy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sy ( CPSO# 52145 )

Business Address:
Tomken Center
925 Rathburn Road East
Mississauga ON  L4W 4C3
Phone Number: (905) 848-6633

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER YU SY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1983