Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Sy, William Yu (CPSO#: 64583)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Filipino, Taiwanese

Education:Far Eastern University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4190 Finch Avenue East
Suite 203
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 299-8060
Fax: (416) 299-9046
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM YU SY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Aug 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Aug 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Aug 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1995