Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Syan, Swaran Kaur (CPSO#: 68582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Oct 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Punjabi University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
333 Mountain View Rd
Georgetown ON  L7G 6E8
Phone: (905) 877-8278
Fax: (905) 873-2288
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10970 ,Bramlea Rd unit 1-5
Brampton ON  L6R 3X1
Canada
Phone: 289-569-0124
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

MCI doctors
Bramlea Shopping Centre
25 PeelCentre Drive
Brampton ON  L6T5M2
Canada
Phone: 905-793-7077
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

urgent Medical clinic
7333 Goreway Rd
Malton ON  L4T 2T8
Canada
Phone: 905-255-2504
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Swaran K. Syan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Syan ( CPSO# 68582 )

Business Address:
180 Sandalwood Parkway
Brampton ON  L6Z 1Y4
Phone Number: (905) 846-9255

Business Address:
7333 Goreway Drive
Mississauga ON  L4T 2T8
Phone Number: (905) 255-2504

Business Address:
10970 Bramlea Road
Brampton ON  L6R 3X1
Phone Number: (289) 569-0124

Medical Records Location

Address: Ontario Document Storage Tel: 1-705-560-8461
Date Received: 10 Jan 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1997
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 14 Apr 2015
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 14 Apr 2015
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 15 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 17 May 2016
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 17 May 2016
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 17 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 17 May 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:01 a.m., May 17, 2016 by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            Swaran Kaur Syan:

                  At her own expense, Dr. Syan shall participate in and successfully
                  complete, within 6 months of the date of this Order, individualized
                  instruction in medical ethics satisfactory to the College, with an
                  instructor approved by the College. The instructor shall provide a
                  summative report to the College including his or her conclusion about
                  whether the instruction was completed successfully by Dr. Syan. 
                  
            As from 11:59 p.m., April 14, 2015 by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            Swaran Kaur Syan:

            (i)   Dr. Syan shall not be involved in clinical research studies in any
                  manner, including but not limited to the enrollment of patients in
                  clinical research studies. 

            (ii)  Dr. Syan shall practice only in a group setting and/or as a member of a
                  group of physicians with cross-coverage. 

            (iii) Dr. Syan shall see no more than a combined total of thirty (30) patients
                  per week in her family medicine and/or walk-in medicine practice. 

            As from October 10, 2012, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Swaran Kaur Syan, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Syan to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Swaran Syan may not engage in the practice of Mesotherapy,
                  Lipodissolve or any other treatment using injectable substances purported
                  to remove or reduce fat.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 May 2016
Summary:

On May 16, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Syan has committed an act of professional misconduct in that she has 
engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable, or 
unprofessional. 

Dr. Swaran Kaur Syan, a family physician with a cosmetic practice who graduated from medical 
school at Punjabi University, breached a past Order of the Discipline Committee that had 
suspended her certificate of registration when she saw 11 patients in May 2015. 

On April 14, 2015, a prior Panel of the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Syan had committed 
an act of professional misconduct in that she had failed to maintain the standard of practice of 
the profession in respect of 20 patients. The Committee directed the Registrar to suspend Dr. 
Syan’s certificate of registration for a period of two months commencing on April 14, 2015.  

On May 4, 2015, Dr. Syan saw four patients in her cosmetic practice, and on May 5, 2015, she 
saw a further seven patients. Dr. Syan saw all of these patients in breach of the April 2015 
Order of the Discipline Committee which had suspended her certificate of registration. The 
Committee in the present case found that, in breaching the April 2015 Order, Dr. Syan engaged 
in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable, or 
unprofessional. 

PENALTY 

The Discipline Committee: 

   -  ordered Dr. Syan to appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
   -  directed the Registrar to suspend Dr. Syan's certificate of registration for a two month 
      period, to commence at 12:01 a.m. on May 17, 2016. 
   -  directed the Registrar to impose the following as a term, condition and limitation on Dr. 
      Syan's certificate of registration: 
         o  At her own expense, Dr. Syan shall participate in and successfully complete, 
            within 6 months of the date of this Order, individualized instruction in medical 
            ethics satisfactory to the College, with an instructor approved by the College. The 
            instructor shall provide a summative report to the College including his or her 
            conclusion about whether the instruction was completed successfully by Dr. 
            Syan. 

COSTS 

The Discipline Committee ordered Dr. Syan to pay to the College its costs of this proceeding in 
the amount of $5,000 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): May 16, 2016


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Apr 2015
Summary:

  

 On April 14, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Swaran Kaur Syan committed an act 
 of professional misconduct in that she failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
 profession in respect of her care and treatment of 20 patients. Dr. Syan admitted to the allegation. 
  
 The allegations arose from an investigation into Dr. Syan’s clinical care and two patient 
 complaints. With respect to the investigation into Dr. Syan’s clinical care, in 2011 the College 
 requested further information in response an affirmative answer on Dr. Syan’s Registration 
 Renewal. Dr. Syan advised that a patient of her family practice had a myocardial infarction while 
 enrolled in a clinical research study for hypertension medication. Dr. Syan was a sub-investigator 
 for the study and had referred the patient for the clinical research study. The College considered 
 this information and commenced an investigation in order to obtain a broader view of Dr. Syan’s 
 practice including her enrollment of patients in clinical research studies.     
  
 Dr. X, a specialist in family medicine, was retained by the College to provide an opinion on Dr. 
 Syan’s care. Dr. X reviewed a total of 25 charts and noted a number of areas where Dr. Syan’s 
 general family practice and her enrollment of patients in clinical research studies was 
 unsatisfactory including: 
  
 With regard to record-keeping, for example: Dr. Syan’s handwritten progress notes were difficult 
 to read and sometimes illegible; it was difficult to identify patients’ subjective concerns, patient 
 history, physical findings, diagnoses, treatment plans, and what medications were being refilled; 
 the patients’ Cumulative Patient Profiles were not up-to-date or accurate; there was no accurate 
 list of current medications for patients, including duration and dosages, and a review of lab, 
 specialist and hospital reports revealed a number of diagnoses not documented on Dr. Syan’s 
 charts. 
  
 With regard to overall care, for example: there was a failure to monitor the side-effects of 
 medications and to consider the effects of poly-pharmacy; there was a failure to routinely 
 conduct age-appropriate preventive screening; and narcotics and benzodiazepines were 
 prescribed with no clear diagnosis. 
  
 With regard to the enrollment of patients in clinical research studies, for example: patients were 
 enrolled in research studies for which they did not clearly meet the study criteria, specialists were 
 not aware of patients’ enrolment in research studies in which they would be receiving 
 medications, it was not possible to determine from a patient’s family practice chart whether the 
patient was enrolled in a clinical research trial, when enrollment in the trial had taken place, what 
medications the patient was on in the course of the trial, and when or whether the patient’s 
participation in the trial had ended. 
  
 Dr. X specified that the deficiencies in Dr. Syan’s practice did not arise because Dr. Syan’s 
 patient charts were handwritten rather than electronic, but were rather indicative of a general 
 failure to meet the standard of practice of the profession of a family physician in the care and 
 treatment of her patients. 
  
 With respect to patient complaints, Patient A saw Dr. Syan’s from June to November 2012. 
 Patient A’s daughter complained that Dr. Syan failed to adequately investigate or treat her 
  

 mother’s ongoing health concerns. Dr. X opined that Dr. Syan provided care that, at times, fell 
 below the standard expected and charting that was consistently brief, lacking in essential 
 components, did not document medications, and was, overall, sub-standard. 
  
 Patient B was seen by Dr. Syan at a walk-in clinic when he sought care for his elbow after a fall. 
 Patient B’s wife complained that Dr. Syan failed to order an x-ray. Dr. Syan diagnosed an 
 olecranon bursitis and aspirated 20cc of blood. Patient B attended upon another physician and 
 was subsequently found to have an elbow fracture for which he required surgery. Dr. X opined 
 that Dr. Syan’s care of Patient B fell below the standard of practice of the profession. Dr. X 
 noted that the first diagnosis to be considered and ruled out given this patient’s history and 
 findings would be a fracture and an x-ray would be a standard investigation to determine this. 
  
 On November 11, 2014, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (ICRC) directed the 
Registrar to impose terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration of Dr. Syan 
on an interim basis, prior to the hearing of this matter. In accordance with the terms of the 
Section 37 Order, Dr. Syan has seen approximately ten patients a week, with supervision. Recent 
 reports received from Dr. Syan’s supervisors indicate that she has displayed an appropriate level 
 of medical knowledge and clinical judgment in her care and treatment of patients, that her 
 record-keeping is improving and she has followed their recommendations.   
  
 The relevant facts from Dr. Syan’s history with the College include the following: In July 2008, 
 Dr. Syan completed the Medical Record-Keeping Course. In February 2011, Dr. Syan was 
 cautioned by the ICRC to maintain adequate and legible records and they directed that she 
complete the Medical Record-Keeping course for a second time and be re-assessed. In 
 September 2012, Dr. Syan completed the Medical Record-Keeping course for a second time. Dr. 
 Syan is currently completing a preceptorship in record-keeping in her non-surgical cosmetic 
 medicine practice and will be reassessed in this area of her practice upon completion of the 
 preceptorship, which is scheduled to be completed in July 2015. 
  
 The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
    -  The Registrar suspend Dr. Syan’s certificate of registration for a period of two (2) 
       months, commencing from April 14, 2015 at 11:59 p.m. 
    -  The Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Syan's 
       certificate of registration: 
       (a) For an indefinite period of time, Dr. Syan shall not be involved in clinical research 
          studies in any manner, including but not limited to the enrollment of patients in 
          clinical research studies.  While Dr. Syan is subject to this restriction, the following 
          statement shall appear on the public register: Dr. Syan shall not be involved in 
          clinical research studies in any manner, including but not limited to the enrollment of 
          patients in clinical research studies; 
       (b) For an indefinite period of time, Dr. Syan shall practice only in a group setting and/or 
          as a member of a group of physicians with cross-coverage. While Dr. Syan is subject 
          to this restriction, the following statement shall appear on the public register: Dr. 
          Syan shall practice only in a group setting and/or as a member of a group of 
          physicians with cross-coverage; 
              

(c) Dr. Syan shall, before June 14, 2015, deliver an undertaking in the form attached [to 
   the Order] as Schedule “A” signed by a College-approved clinical supervisor, (the 
   “Clinical Supervisor”), whose role shall be guided by the Individualized Education 
   Plan  (the “IEP”) attached [to the Order] at Schedule “B”.  Commencing on the day 
   that Dr. Syan resumes practice following her suspension, Dr. Syan may practice 
   family medicine and/or walk-in medicine only with the supervision of the Clinical 
   Supervisor.  Dr. Syan shall be subject to this term, condition and limitation for a 
   period of no less than twelve (12) months, and shall be released therefrom only upon 
   receipt of satisfactory report(s) from her Clinical Supervisor and approval, in its sole 
   discretion, by the College; 
(d) If Dr. Syan fails to retain a Clinical Supervisor as required above or if, prior to the 
   completion of the required period of supervision above, Dr. Syan’s Clinical 
   Supervisor is unable or unwilling to continue in that role, Dr. Syan shall within 
   twenty (20) days deliver a new undertaking in the form attached [to the Order] as 
   Schedule “A” signed by a new College-approved clinical supervisor, failing which 
   she shall cease to practice family medicine and walk-in medicine until such time as 
   she has retained a Clinical Supervisor and the fact that she has ceased to practice 
   family medicine and walk-in medicine shall be a term, condition and limitation on 
   her Certificate of Registration until that time;  
(e) After Dr. Syan has delivered an executed Undertaking from a Clinical Supervisor to 
   the College as described above in paragraph 4(c), Dr. Syan shall see patients in her 
   family medicine and/or walk-in medicine practice only in accordance with the 
   Remediation Program described at subparagraphs 4(e)(i)-(viii) (the “Remediation 
   Program”), until the Remediation Program has been completed: 
  i. Throughout the Remediation Program, Dr. Syan shall maintain an up-to-date log 
     (the “Patient Log”) listing every patient seen by her in her family medicine and/or 
     walk-in medicine practice, including the patient’s name, date of birth, OHIP 
     number, date of appointment or visit, and reason for visit.  Dr. Syan shall maintain 
     the original Patient Log and shall send a copy to the College at the end of every 
     calendar month; 
  ii. In Phase One of the Remediation Program, Dr. Syan shall see no more than a 
     combined total of thirty (30) patients per week in her family medicine and/or 
     walk-in medicine practice.  Dr. Syan shall submit these patients’ charts and the 
     Patient Log to the Clinical Supervisor for review and shall meet with the Clinical 
     Supervisor at least once every seven (7) days to discuss the Clinical Supervisor’s 
     review of her patients’ charts and any concerns arising therefrom, including with 
     particular reference to the educational needs identified in the IEP attached [to the 
     Order] at Schedule “B”.  While Dr. Syan is subject to this restriction, the 
     following statement shall appear on the public register: Dr. Syan shall see no 
     more than a combined total of thirty (30) patients per week in her family medicine 
     and/or walk-in medicine practice; 
  iii. Also in Phase One of the Remediation Program, Dr. Syan shall develop a 
     continuing professional development plan (the “CPD Plan”), in conjunction with 
     her Clinical Supervisor, addressing the educational needs identified in the IEP 
     attached [to the Order] at Schedule “B”, to be submitted to the College for 
     approval.  The CPD Plan must include personal learning objectives and a plan to 
              

   meet those objectives.  The plan must meet the requirements for continuing 
   professional development set by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
   Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada; 
iv. Upon approval by the College of the CPD Plan and if reports from the Clinical 
   Supervisor indicate that it is appropriate to do so and if approved by the College, 
   after a minimum of one (1) month in Phase One of the Remediation Program, Dr. 
   Syan may move to Phase Two of the Remediation Program, during which she 
   shall see no more than a combined total of sixty (60) patients per week in her 
   family medicine and/or walk-in medicine practice.  Dr. Syan shall submit 50% of 
   these patients’ charts, as selected by the Clinical Supervisor, and the Patient Log 
   to the Clinical Supervisor for review and shall meet with the Clinical Supervisor 
   at least once every seven (7) days to discuss the Clinical Supervisor’s review of 
   her patients’ charts and any concerns arising therefrom, including with particular 
   reference to the educational needs identified in the IEP attached [to the Order] at 
   Schedule “B”. While Dr. Syan is subject to this restriction, the following 
   statement shall appear on the public register: Dr. Syan shall see no more than a 
   combined total of sixty (60) patients per week in her family medicine and/or 
   walk-in medicine practice; 
v. If reports from the Clinical Supervisor indicate that it is appropriate to do so and if 
   approved by the College, after a minimum of two (2) months in Phase Two of the 
   Remediation Program, Dr. Syan may move to Phase Three of the Remediation 
   Program, during which she shall see no more than a combined total of ninety (90) 
   patients per week in her family medicine and/or walk-in medicine practice. Dr. 
   Syan shall submit 25% of these patients’ charts, as selected by the Clinical 
   Supervisor, and the Patient Log to the Clinical Supervisor for review and shall 
   meet with the Clinical Supervisor at least once every fourteen (14) days to discuss 
   the Clinical Supervisor’s review of her patients’ charts and any concerns arising 
   therefrom, including with particular reference to the educational needs identified 
   in the IEP attached [to the Order] at Schedule “B”. While Dr. Syan is subject to 
   this restriction, the following statement shall appear on the public register: Dr. 
   Syan shall see no more than a combined total of ninety (90) patients per week in 
   her family medicine and/or walk-in medicine practice; 
vi. If reports from the Clinical Supervisor indicate that it is appropriate to do so and if 
   approved by the College, after a minimum of three (3) months in Phase Three of 
   the Remediation Program, Dr. Syan may move to Phase Four of the Remediation 
   Program, during which she shall see no more than a combined total of one 
   hundred and twenty (120) patients per week in her family medicine and/or walk-
   in medicine practice. Dr. Syan shall submit 25% of these patients’ charts, as 
   selected by the Clinical Supervisor, and the Patient Log to the Clinical Supervisor 
   for review and shall meet with the Clinical Supervisor at least once every thirty 
   (30) days to discuss the Clinical Supervisor’s review of her patients’ charts and 
   any concerns arising therefrom, including with particular reference to the 
   educational needs identified in the IEP attached [to the Order] at Schedule “B”. 
   While Dr. Syan is subject to this restriction, the following statement shall appear 
   on the public register: Dr. Syan shall see no more than a combined total of one 
              

      hundred and twenty (120) patients per week in her family medicine and/or walk-
      in medicine practice; 
   vii. If reports from the Clinical Supervisor indicate that it is appropriate to do so and if 
      approved by the College, after a minimum of six (6) months in Phase Four of the 
      Remediation Program, Dr. Syan may complete the Remediation Program; 
   viii. Throughout the Remediation Program, Dr. Syan shall cooperate with her Clinical 
      Supervisor and shall abide by all recommendations of her Clinical Supervisor 
      including but not limited to recommendations about her care, recordkeeping, 
      practice improvements, practice management, and continuing education. 
(f) Dr. Syan shall consent to the disclosure by her Clinical Supervisor to the College and 
    by the College to her Clinical Supervisor, of all information the Clinical Supervisor 
    or the College deems necessary or desirable in order to fulfill the Clinical 
    Supervisor’s Undertaking and to monitor Dr. Syan’s compliance with the Order.   
(g) Approximately six (6) months after completing the Remediation Program, Dr. Syan 
    shall undergo a reassessment of her family medicine and walk-in medicine practice 
    by a College-appointed Assessor (the “First Reassessment”).  The assessment may 
    include a review of Dr. Syan’s patient charts, direct observations, and interviews 
    with staff and/or patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.  Dr. 
    Syan shall abide by all recommendations made by the Assessor, and the Assessor 
    shall report the results of the assessment to the College. 
(h) Approximately twelve (12) months following the completion of the First 
    Reassessment, Dr. Syan shall undergo a second reassessment of her family medicine 
    and walk-in medicine practice by a College-appointed Assessor (the “Second 
    Reassessment”).  The assessment may include a review of Dr. Syan’s patient charts, 
    direct observations, and interviews with staff and/or patients and any other tools 
    deemed necessary by the College.  Dr. Syan shall abide by all recommendations 
    made by the Assessor, and the Assessor shall report the results of the assessment to 
    the College. 
(i) The First Reassessment and the Second Reassessment shall take the place of the 
    reassessment directed by the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the 
    College in February 2011. 
(j) Dr. Syan shall consent to sharing of information among the Assessor(s), the Clinical 
    Supervisor, and the College as any of them deem necessary or desirable in order to 
    fulfill their respective obligations. 
(k) Dr. Syan shall inform the College of each and every location where she practices 
    family medicine and walk-in medicine, in any jurisdiction (her “Practice 
    Location(s)”) within fifteen (15) days of this Order, and shall inform the College of 
    any and all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice 
    at that location, until the results of the reassessments of her practice have been 
    reported to the College. 
(l) Dr. Syan shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of her practice and patient 
    charts by a College representative(s) for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing her 
    compliance with the terms of this Order. 
(m) Dr. Syan shall consent to the College making appropriate enquiries of the Ontario 
    Health Insurance Program, the Narcotics Monitoring System and/or any person who 
    or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor 
              

      her compliance with this Order and shall promptly sign such consents as may be 
      necessary for the College to obtain information from these persons or institutions. 
   (n) Dr. Syan shall be responsible for any and all reasonable costs associated with 
      implementing the terms of this Order. 
- Dr. Syan appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Syan pay costs to the College in the amount of $4,460, within thirty (30) days of the 
   date of this Order. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 14, 2015