Syed, Arif Mustafa (CPSO#: 71520)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Alberta, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6 - 1010 Dream Crest Road
Mississauga ON  L5V 3A4
Phone: (905) 813-9674
Fax: (905) 813-9459
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arif Syed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Syed ( CPSO# 71520 )

Business Address:
6 - 1010 Dream Crest Road
Mississauga ON  L5V 3A4
Phone Number: (905) 813-9674

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jul 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIF MUSTAFA SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Mar 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 1999 to 31 Mar 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 1999 to 31 Mar 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2000 to 31 Mar 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2001 to 31 Mar 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2002 to 31 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2003