Syed, Jaffer Ali (CPSO#: 72558)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
430 The Boardwalk
Suite 210
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 741-5252 Ext. 224
Fax: (519) 741-5772
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Syed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Syed ( CPSO# 72558 )

Business Address:
Regional Cardiology Services
208 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 576-3099

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 30 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAFFER ALI SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002