Syed, Saadat Ali Shah (CPSO#: 25202)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Italian, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saadat and Shaista Syed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Syed ( CPSO# 28531 )
Dr. S. Syed ( CPSO# 25202 )

Business Address:
103 - 4640 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M3N 2K5
Phone Number: (416) 665-1641

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2015
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2016
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 27 Oct 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 27 Oct 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As of October 27, 2017, Dr. Saadat Syed has ceased to practice until such time
            as he has obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College. 

            As from 11:59 p.m., September 21, 2017, by order of the Quality Assurance
            Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following
            terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Saadat Ali Shah Syed:

            Clinical Supervision

            (i)   Within 20 days of the date of this Order, Dr. Syed must obtain a clinical
                  supervisor ("Clinical Supervisor") who is acceptable to the College.
                  Beginning immediately on the day Dr. Syed obtains a Clinical Supervisor
                  and for, at minimum, ninety (90) days, Dr. Syed shall practice only under
                  high-level supervision with the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical
                  Supervisor must work on-site with Dr. Syed at all times, review Dr.
                  Syed's charts for each patient before the patient leaves the office and
                  approve of the proposed treatment and follow-up plan in the patient
                  chart.  The Clinical Supervisor will be the Most Responsible Physician as
                  defined in the Guidelines for College-Directed Supervision.  

            (ii)  After the minimum period of high level supervision, and only if the
                  Clinical Supervisor recommends, and the College approves, Dr. Syed will
                  practice under moderate supervision as outlined in the Clinical
                  Supervisor's undertaking and the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP").
                  The moderate supervision will last for the remaining term of this Order,
                  during which time Dr. Syed will be the Most Responsible Physician for all
                  patient care.  During this time the Clinical Supervisor will, on a
                  bi-weekly basis, observe Dr. Syed in practice and review fifteen (15) to
                  twenty (20) of Dr. Syed's patient charts, discuss Dr. Syed's care and
                  treatment plan, identify any concerns regarding the care and treatment
                  plan, and make recommendations for improvement.   

            (iii) The Clinical Supervisor shall submit a report to the College every month
                  for the period of high-level supervision.  During the period of
                  moderate-level supervision, the Clinical Supervisor shall submit a report
                  to the College every three months, and will keep a log of all patient
                  charts reviewed along with patient identifiers.

            (iv)  If Dr. Syed is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor as set out in (i)
                  above, or if the Clinical Supervisor and Dr. Syed have terminated their
                  clinical supervision arrangement, Dr. Syed must cease practising until
                  such time as he has obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the
                  College.

            (v)   The fact that as of September 21, 2017, Dr. Syed may only practise
                  medicine under high-level supervision, where the Clinical Supervisor
                  works on-site with Dr. Syed and is the Most Responsible Physician, and
                  must cease practising if he does not have such a supervisor, constitutes
                  a term, condition or limitation on Dr. Syed's certificate of registration
                  and will be included on the public register.

            Monitoring Terms

            (vi)  Dr. Syed shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs,
                  charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the
                  terms of this Order. 

            (vii) Dr. Syed shall provide the College with his irrevocable consent to make
                  appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan, in order for
                  the College to monitor his compliance with the terms of this Order, and
                  shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Supervisor and to the
                  College of all information necessary to fulfill the Clinical Supervisor's
                  Undertaking and to monitor Dr. Syed's compliance with the Order.

            (viii)Dr. Syed shall permit and not interfere with unannounced inspections of
                  his practice by a College representative in order to monitor the terms of
                  the Order. 

            (ix)  Dr. Syed must inform the College of each and every location that he
                  practices, including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and
                  office(s) in any jurisdiction within five (5) days of this Order and
                  within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.