Syed, Yasmeen (CPSO#: 56597)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2-1221 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3E2
Phone: (416) 439-1377
Fax: (416) 913-1434
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASMEEN SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991