Sykes, Anne-Marie Gisele (CPSO#: 62337)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 2006