Sylvain, Josee Elizabeth (CPSO#: 97881)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEE ELIZABETH SYLVAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYLVAIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2016