Sylvester, Michael Joseph (CPSO#: 66579)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Vasectomy Clinic
725 Arlington Park Place
Kingston
Kingston ON  K7M 7E4
Phone: (613) 546-1858
Fax: (613) 546-4060
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

146 Stuart Street, Lasalle Building
Queen's University
Kingston, Ontario
K7L 3N6
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Canada
Phone: 613-533-2508
Fax: 613-533-2347
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patel and Sylvester Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sylvester ( CPSO# 66579 )
Dr. R. Patel ( CPSO# 66574 )

Business Address:
725 Arlington Park Place
Kingston ON  K7M 7E4
Phone Number: (613) 546-1858

Business Address:
146 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2506

Business Address:
78 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOSEPH SYLVESTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYLVESTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1995